Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Om-Other case in the jurisdiction of Otsego County. This case was filed in Otsego County Superior Courts with Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCoccoma, Hon. Michael V. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2014 |
CategoryOm-Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2015 | Hearing |
Trial Set For Coccoma (Trial Part) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
January 30, 2015 | Hearing |
Discontinued Coccoma (Court Activity) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
November 26, 2014 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Coccoma (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
October 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Note of Issue Filed Coccoma (Court Activity) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
May 07, 2014 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Coccoma (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
January 03, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Coccoma (Motion Part) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
December 13, 2013 | Hearing |
Return Date (Motion #001) Coccoma (Motion Part) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
November 12, 2013 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 01/03/2014Decided Before Justice: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. Answer demanded: No Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
November 12, 2013 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Coccoma (Motion Part) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.