Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Selip, Mitchell Howard, Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Jamie M French, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 26, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Oswego. The plaintiff, Capital One, N.A., is suing the defendant, Jamie M French, for breach of a consumer credit transaction. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant o...
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 13, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: January 02, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: December 29, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 29, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: October 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 26, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 29, 2023202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: October 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2024 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 29, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
December 29, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
December 29, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
December 29, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
December 29, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT AOF |
||
December 29, 2023 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
November 20, 2023 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
November 13, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 13, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.