Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Owner Trustee For Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019-Gs7, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Leopold, Saul O, against John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Theresa Lamb As Heir At Law Of Edward L. Powers A K A Edward Lawrence Powers, Tonya L. Crisafulli As Heir At Law Of Edward L. Powers A K A Edward Lawrence Powers, Unknown Heirs At Law Of Edward L. Powers A K A Edward Lawrence Powers, And If They Be Dead, Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In, Or Generally Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Allison J Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllison J Nelson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as the owner trustee for Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019-GS7, against the unknown heirs at law of Edward L. Powers, also known as Edward Lawrence Powers. The compl...
ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: January 09, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Death Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 08, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2024ANSWER
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024ANSWER
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A COM Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 23, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B S&C Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C S&C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A S&C Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 23, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 08, 2024 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
January 08, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 08, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 08, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service |
||
January 08, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Affirmation of Investigation of Heirship with Supporting Exhibits Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affirmation of Investigation of Heirship with Supporting Exhibits Redacted |
||
January 08, 2024 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 08, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Death Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR Death Certificate Redacted |
||
January 08, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 08, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.