Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Tbf Financial, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Marks, Robert John, Wegman, Michael Joseph, against Kenneth C. Scott Jr., Performance Heating And Cooling, Inc, Sean P. Beardsley, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Karen M Brandt Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren M Brandt Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a legal document filed by TBF Financial, LLC against Performance Heating and Cooling, Inc., Sean P. Beardsley, and Kenneth C. Scott Jr. The complaint alleges that Performance Heating and Cooling entered into two agreements with Swif...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 15, 2023ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 15, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 11, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 22, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
December 13, 2023 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Military Search |
||
December 11, 2023 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
December 11, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
December 11, 2023 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
November 15, 2023 | Affidavit of Serivce- Kenneth C. Scott Jr | ||
November 15, 2023 | Affidavit of Service - Performance Heating & Cooling | ||
November 15, 2023 | Affidavit of Service - Sean P. Beardsley |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.