Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Selip, Mitchell Howard, Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Amber Verity, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is filed by Discover Bank against Amber Verity in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Oswego. Discover Bank designates Oswego County as the place of trial, and the defendant resides in Oswego County. The complaint all...
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 28, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 29, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 16, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 16, 2023202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DOD MILITARY SEARCH |
||
December 28, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 28, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
December 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION NON-EXPIRATION OF SOL |
||
December 28, 2023 | AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
November 14, 2023 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
November 06, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 16, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Charge Off Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.