Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Kim, Jason, against Lisa Gage, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Secondary Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a consumer credit transaction case filed by CACH, LLC against Lisa Gage. The complaint alleges that Lisa Gage entered into a loan agreement with HSBC Consumer Lending (USA), Inc. on or around July 11, 2007. The loan agreement is att...
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: October 31, 2023202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: October 02, 2023SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Charge-Off Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 29, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 29, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
October 02, 2023 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
September 25, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 25, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 29, 2023 |
SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Charge-Off Redacted per 22 NYCRR Charge-Off Redacted |
||
August 29, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.