Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lammmon, Starr, Oshiro, Shirly L., Wyatt, Lisa, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Bishop, Matthew Clay, against Lammon, Starr, represented by Wood, Charles Bell, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Cycle Time1079 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; Wyatt, L. et al vs. Lammon, S. Motion OSC Details: 221620 - DLR Status of Removed Case ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jul 24 2009 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Restored to Court's Control Removed Court Control-Binding Arb - Termination Date: 2009-07-24 |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931410 - Attorney for Cross Complainant DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT [931410] |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; Wyatt, L. et al vs. Lammon, S. Motion OSC Details: 211201 - Court's Motion To Dismiss ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; Wyatt, L. et al vs. Lammon, S. Motion OSC Details: 221620 - DLR Status of Removed Case ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.