Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Carol Clark, Michael Clark, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Antonucci, David Peter, against Winter Harbor Llc, represented by Charlton, J Eric, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with James W Mccarthy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W Mccarthy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Division) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time133 days |
ORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: April 11, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2018ANSWER
Date: April 25, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 19, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 16, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 16, 2018RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: March 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Vacating Stay and Affidavit of Service | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment and Affidavit of Service | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER (Motion #001) ORDER VACATING STAY OF SALE |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Answer to Complaint |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Memo/Hearing Date |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
ADMISSION OF SERVICE (Motion #001) M Clark v. Winter Harbor Affidavit of service for #33, 34 |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Ex. A to reply aff. for M Clark v. Winter Harbor |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) M Clark v. Winter Harbor LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.