Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
American Express Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Migliaccio, Anthony J, Shur, Joseph M, against Consulting Services Inc Entropic, Consulting Services, Inc Entropic, David Aka Silliman A K A David R Silliman And Entropic Consulting Services, Inc, David R Aka Silliman, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with James W Mccarthy presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 13, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time463 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2018STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: August 10, 2018NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 26, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 23, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 13, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001) | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Redacted |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001) | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.