Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Grid National, Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Bennett, Kathleen Marie, against Garry W Phinney, Larry W Phinney, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Scott Del Conte presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Condemnation |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
PETITION
Date: September 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 14, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: September 14, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 14, 2021ORDER - FINAL
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 09, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 14, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 14, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: September 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 08, 2021 |
ORDER - FINAL Final Order Pursuant to EDPL Section 402 |
||
November 09, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Map and easements |
||
November 09, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 08, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 27, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 14, 2021 | PETITION | ||
September 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Temporary Easement |
||
September 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C legal description |
||
September 14, 2021 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Petition w/ Notice of Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.