Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Damsky, Edward Jay, Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Scott Knight, represented by Borgese, Frank Junior, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Scott Del Conte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott Del Conte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 23, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 10, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 11, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 08, 2022AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 11, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 08, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 08, 2022AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 11, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 20, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 08, 2022AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 08, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 20, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 01, 2021ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 15, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: July 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 08, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 08, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
August 11, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 11, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
August 11, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
August 11, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
July 20, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) For an Order Granting Default Judgment |
||
July 20, 2022 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
July 15, 2022 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Order Granting Default Judgment |
||
July 15, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 10, 2022 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.