Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Christina M Lehmann, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Izzo, Janet M., against Daniel G Do Coty, Oswego County Ob-Gyn Pc, Raj K Md Mahajan, represented by Defrancesco, Christopher Francis, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Scott Del Conte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott Del Conte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Pleadings Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 04, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 07, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 26, 2021NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: April 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: February 26, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 04, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 07, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 21, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 13, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 28, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 13, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Trial Scheduling Letter |
||
December 13, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 21, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Pleadings Redacted per 22 NYCRR Pleadings Redacted |
||
April 04, 2022 | NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE | ||
April 04, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
April 04, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE | ||
April 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Proof of Auths |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.