Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
21St Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Catalfimo, Michael J, Catalfimo, Michael J., against Credit Acceptance Corporation, Erik Aka Cowley, Erik M Aka Cowley A K A Erik Cowley, Jamiee A Aka Phelps, Jamiee Aka Phelps A K A Jamiee A. Phelps, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with Norman W Seiter presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time534 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001)
Date: February 19, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 10, 2020ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #001)
Date: March 05, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 18, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 12, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: January 10, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #001) | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001) Amended NOM for Cancellation of NOP |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Amended NOM |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOM for Cancellation of Notice of Pendency and Discontinuance of Action |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order Discontinuing Action and Directing Cancellation of NOP |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) AOS of Joanne E. Stein |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) AOS on Credit Acceptance Corporation |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Notice of Appearance of Jamiee Phelps |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) AOS on Jamiee Phelps |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) AOS on Erick M. Cowley |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.