Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Of Application Matter, Oswego County Quarter Midget Club, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Tice, Sunny I., against County Of Oswego, Town Of Assessor Volney, Town Of Volney, Volney Town Of Board Of Assessment Review, represented by Oudemool, Dirk Jon, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with Norman W Seiter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNorman W Seiter Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time244 days |
ANSWER
Date: August 09, 2018ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001)
Date: October 05, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 09, 2018NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: August 24, 2018PETITION *Corrected*
Date: July 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001) Consolidation and Scheduling Order - Consolidating EFC-2018-1240 into C-2017-1031 |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) *Corrected* | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITION *Corrected* | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER TAX ASSESSMENT REVIEW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.