Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Warshaw, David Barry, against Michelle Aka Foster A K A Michelle L Paschall, Michelle L Aka Paschall, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 24, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions316 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time318 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 24, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.