Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grid National, Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Melita, Norina Ana, against Thomas J Clark, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with Norman W Seiter presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 19, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Property Damage) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions337 days |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time462 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2019ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)
Date: April 11, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: October 24, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: April 08, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001) | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE (Motion #001) | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.