Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Kenneth Scott Jr, Performance Heating And Cooling Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Poplawski, Ryan Michael, against Performance Heating And Cooling Inc, Sean Beardsley, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts Oswego County Supreme Court with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 25, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseOswego County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time478 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 15, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 14, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 09, 2019PETITION *Corrected*
Date: April 25, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2018ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: April 10, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 07, 2019ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: June 06, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 15, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 15, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 04, 2019RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 25, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 07, 2019ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: January 09, 2019ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: August 16, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 01, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: April 26, 2018ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: May 01, 2018ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: April 26, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2018NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: August 15, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 15, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: May 01, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: February 19, 2019ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 20, 2019ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: March 07, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: March 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A *Corrected*
Date: April 25, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B *Corrected*
Date: April 25, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 15, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 07, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) Proposed order |
|
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order Relieving Counsel for Petitioner |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.