Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Dlj Mortgage Capital Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nierer, Cynthia Anne, against Glenda Arden, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 14, 2019RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 14, 2019NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 31, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 06, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 27, 2020ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: March 14, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: June 10, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 11, 2019ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: February 28, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2018ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: March 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 04, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 31, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: March 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2020CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: May 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2020 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stip to disco |
||
May 29, 2020 |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS stip to cancel lp & affirmation |
||
February 28, 2020 | ORDER - REFERENCE | ||
February 19, 2020 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter of Motion Adjournment with Affidavit of Service |
||
January 27, 2020 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 27, 2020 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 27, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Note with Affidavit of Note Possession |
||
January 27, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affirmation pursuant to Admin Order 431/11 or Certificate of Merit |
||
January 27, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Mortgage & Modification Agreement |
||
January 27, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.