Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with HON. NORMAN W. SEITER, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. NORMAN W. SEITER, JR. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryForeclosure Conf Ineligible |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time43 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED SEITER, JR. (Court Activity) Judge: HON. NORMAN W. SEITER, JR. |
|
March 01, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) SEITER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. NORMAN W. SEITER, JR. |
|
February 22, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) SEITER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. NORMAN W. SEITER, JR. |
|
February 08, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) SEITER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. NORMAN W. SEITER, JR. |
|
January 17, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) SEITER, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. NORMAN W. SEITER, JR. |
|
January 17, 2018 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE (Motion #001) Decided: 03/01/2018GRANTED Before Justice: HON. NORMAN W. SEITER, JR. Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. NORMAN W. SEITER, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.