Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2016 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time204 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
April 27, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
April 27, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED MCCARTHY (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
March 24, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
March 24, 2017 | Motion |
DISCONTINUANCE (Motion #001) Decided: 04/27/2017ORDER Before Justice: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
February 16, 2017 | Hearing |
SETTLED: LOAN MODIFICATION MCCARTHY (Settlement Conference) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
December 20, 2016 | Hearing |
CONTINUED MCCARTHY (Settlement Conference) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
|
October 05, 2016 | Hearing |
CONTINUED MCCARTHY (Settlement Conference) Judge: HON. JAMES W. MCCARTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.