Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hunt, James T, against David C Killin, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts Orange County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions119 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOrange County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time120 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: February 28, 2018COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: November 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.