Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Unifund Ccr Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Gerald W, Sheerin, John J, against Fabrice D Lubin, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts Orange County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions160 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOrange County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time161 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: April 10, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 31, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
November 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FABRICE D LUBIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.