Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
William S. Peterson As Administrator Of The Estate Of Laurie A. Peterson, And Individually,, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fontana, Lucille A, Markhoff, Nancy Allen, against Lynne S. Schroh, Marshall A. Johnson, William P. Schroh Jr., represented by Bentivegna, Jennifer E., Boden, Stephanie L, Conklin, Kevin T, Salvi, Sara L, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Elaine Slobod presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 15, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 01, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 07, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 15, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 15, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 01, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 02, 2018SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 06, 2020SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 16, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 01, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 15, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 13, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 21, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 21, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 01, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 19, 2018STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 08, 2019SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 25, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 28, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 01, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: January 08, 2020SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: July 30, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: December 20, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: October 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2021 | Hearing |
VIRTUAL
Judge: Sciortino, Hon. Sandra B. |
|
June 01, 2020 | Hearing |
CONTROL PURPOSES ONLY, NO APPEARANCES, THE COURT WILL CONTACT YOU WITH A NEW COURT DATE.
Judge: Sciortino, Hon. Sandra B. |
|
April 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled control purposes only Judge: Milligram, Hon. Steven I. |
|
April 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled
Judge: Milligram, Hon. Steven I. |
|
February 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Milligram, Hon. Steven I. |
|
January 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: Milligram, Hon. Steven I. |
|
January 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Milligram, Hon. Steven I. |
|
January 08, 2020 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
January 07, 2020 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 07, 2020 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.