Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company As Trustee For Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2004-3, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-3 v. William Lewis, Hoa T. Ngo, Omni Credit Services Of Florida, Inc., Erin Capital Management, Llc, Capital One Auto F…
A Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY. Judge Elaine Slobod presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 13, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, NY
Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Overview
18-182473 - StG
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Mar 02, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Mar 02, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: Dec 23, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: Nov 08, 2019ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: Nov 07, 2019ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: Aug 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 1) Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Jul 01, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Jul 01, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Jul 01, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 17, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: Jun 06, 2019FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: May 22, 2019FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: Feb 21, 2019NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: Jan 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Jan 03, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 03, 2019ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: Jan 03, 2019RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: Jan 03, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Sep 13, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 13, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 13, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 13, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Sep 07, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 05, 2018ANSWER
Date: Sep 05, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 30, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 30, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 28, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 28, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 28, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 28, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 28, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 28, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 21, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 21, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Aug 13, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 13, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINTPossible SSN Administratively Redacted Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 13, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2020 | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
March 02, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 23, 2019 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 08, 2019 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 07, 2019 | ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE | ||
August 06, 2019 | ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE | ||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Lis Pendens |
||
July 01, 2019 | EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) | ||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) Affirmation of Regularity |
||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) Affidavit of Indebtedness Affidavit of Indebtedness Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service |
||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) Power of Attorney |
||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Certificate of Merit |
||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) 30 Day Letter |
||
July 01, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Note |
||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #1) Answer |
||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Mortgage |
||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Complaint |
||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Assignment of Mortgage |
||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Department of Defense |
||
July 01, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) 90 day Letter |
||
July 01, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
July 01, 2019 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 01, 2019 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 17, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 06, 2019 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 22, 2019 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
February 21, 2019 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | ||
January 07, 2019 | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
January 03, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT |
||
January 03, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE |
||
January 03, 2019 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
January 03, 2019 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
September 13, 2018 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
September 13, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING 3215 - HOA T NGO |
||
September 13, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING 3215 - WILLIAM LEWIS |
||
September 13, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING 3215 - IVA LEWIS AS JOHN DOE #1 |
||
September 07, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DAT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DAT ... show more |
||
September 07, 2018 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
September 05, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 05, 2018 | ANSWER | ||
August 30, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE INC |
||
August 30, 2018 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
August 28, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - IVA LEWIS AS JOHN DOE #1 |
||
August 28, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - HOA T. NGO |
||
August 28, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - WILLIAM LEWIS |
||
August 28, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - IVA LEWIS AS JOHN DOE #1 |
||
August 28, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS |
||
August 28, 2018 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
August 22, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC |
||
August 22, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - OMNI CREDIT SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC |
||
August 21, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC |
||
August 21, 2018 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
August 13, 2018 |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted |
||
August 13, 2018 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
August 13, 2018 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 13, 2018 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted |