Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Carol Jones, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Sobo, Gregory Marc, against Brosnan Security, Inc., Middletown Resource I, Wal-Mart Stores East, Lp., represented by Irwin, Gregory James, O'Connor, Patricia A, Wellinghorst, Stephen, Whitbeck, Robert Sherwood, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Maria S Vazquezdoles presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: July 01, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: July 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 22, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 31, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 21, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: July 01, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 20, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 02, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 21, 2022ANSWER
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 21, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 28, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
July 22, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 21, 2022 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
July 21, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: discovery demands |
||
July 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
July 21, 2022 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
July 01, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
July 01, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 20, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.