Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barbara Lopane, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dupee, Jon C, against Orange County Medi-Coach, Inc., A K A Medi-Coach, Inc., Tashena L. Davis, Teresa C Kolk, represented by Kaplan, Bryan R, Laurino, Frank J., in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 11, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 13, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 11, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 08, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: December 13, 2022SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: August 29, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 11, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 06, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 13, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND Death Certificate
Date: March 08, 2023ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 11, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 11, 2022ANSWER
Date: February 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Substitution of Attorney |
||
August 29, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Clerk - Firm Name Change |
||
March 08, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Letter to Plaintiff re. Death Certificate of defendant Kolk |
||
March 08, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Death Certificate Death Certificate Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 08, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND police report |
||
December 13, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Various Demands |
||
December 13, 2022 |
CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Certification of Signature |
||
December 13, 2022 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross Claim |
||
December 13, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
December 06, 2022 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.