Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, against James A Eckman, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: February 16, 2022NOTICE
Date: January 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 17, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) SETTLEMENT STIPULATION |
||
February 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 24, 2022 | NOTICE | ||
January 17, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 17, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 12, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
December 14, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q64682222417 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.