Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Fec-Dry Llc, Golden Corral 360, Inc v. Black Magnet Enterprises, Inc., Charles Mcneill, Noela Mcneill, Theresa Salmon, Cleon Webster, Brenda Belmont
A Commercial - Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY. Judge E Loren Williams presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 13, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 11, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, NY
Judge
Hon. E Loren Williams
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Overview
Causes of Action
1. AGAINS-T DEFENDANTS: BREACH OF CONTRACT
2. AGAINST DEFENDANTS: UNJUST ENRICHMENT
3. AGAINST DEFENDANTS: QUANTUM MERUIT
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Feb 06, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Nov 18, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Nov 11, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: Oct 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: Sep 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 1)
Date: Sep 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 1)
Date: Sep 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 1)
Date: Sep 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 1)
Date: Sep 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 1)
Date: Sep 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 1)
Date: Sep 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 1)
Date: Sep 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Sep 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 1)
Date: Sep 08, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Jul 22, 2022STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Jul 21, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: Jun 05, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: Jun 05, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Jun 02, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Mar 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Feb 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Feb 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Feb 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Feb 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Feb 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Feb 15, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: Dec 14, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A 2010 Master Lease and 2019 Sublease Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Dec 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Dec 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Dec 13, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Requesting Decision on Default Motion |
||
November 18, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
November 11, 2022 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
October 19, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 08, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
September 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Aff. of Service on C. McNeill |
||
September 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Aff. of Service on Black Magnet. |
||
September 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Aff. of Service on N. McNeill |
||
September 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Aff. of Service on T. Salmon |
||
September 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Aff. of Service on B. Belmont |
||
September 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Aff. of Service on C. Webster |
||
September 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) One-time Stip. Extending Time to Answer to 3/15/22 |
||
September 08, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint (without exhibits) |
||
July 22, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 21, 2022 | STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
June 05, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
June 05, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 02, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 01, 2022 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
February 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE re Charles McNeill |
||
February 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE re Brenda Belmont |
||
February 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE re Noella McNeill |
||
February 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE re Black Magnet Enterprises, Inc |
||
February 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE re Cleon Webster |
||
February 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE re Theresa Salmon |
||
December 14, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
December 13, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
December 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A 2010 Master Lease and 2019 Sublease Redacted per 22 NYCRR 2010 Master Lease and 2019 Sublease Redacted |
||
December 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C 2018 Letter of Intent |
||
December 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B 2019 Sales Agreement |