Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Melody A. Mackenzie Pllc, Successor In Name Change To Assaf & Mackenzie Pllc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Little, Jason Alan, Sternheimer, Joann, against Leslie Bonder Noble, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts Orange County Supreme Court with Sandra B Sciortino presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 19, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions235 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseOrange County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time503 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 19, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 02, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 19, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 19, 2018SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI
Date: July 19, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 19, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 02, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 29, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 02, 2019ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 21, 2019ORDER - AMENDED
Date: March 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 19, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 19, 2018JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: March 11, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 19, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 26, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 12, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 05, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 02, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 02, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 07, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 07, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 04, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 02, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 22, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 06, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 06, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 27, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 27, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 01, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 01, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: March 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 01, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 27, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 27, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 06, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 06, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service - Leslie Bonder Noble |
||
December 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service - Noble Pies |
||
December 07, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
December 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Judgment Subpoenas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.