Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Michael C Easton, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Drill, Jared Eric, against Charles Romeo, As Proposed Administrator Of The Estate Of Gloria Romeo, Estate Of Gloria Romeo, Public Administrator Of Orange County, Also As Proposed Administrator Of The Estate Of Gloria Romeo, represented by Smiley, Bruce R, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Robert A Onofry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) Death Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Order Notice of Entry |
||
December 16, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Charles Romeo |
||
September 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Estate of Gloria Romeo |
||
September 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Public Administrator of Orange County |
||
September 28, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service for Motion Dismiss |
||
September 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) S&C |
||
September 27, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer |
||
September 27, 2022 |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) RJI |
||
September 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) S&C in related Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.