Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Andrea Arkosi-Lachance, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Dumais, Andrea Lauren, against Peter F. Lachance, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Robert A Onofry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF ENGAGEMENT | ||
January 05, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 16, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 09, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 20, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
October 17, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
October 12, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 12, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 12, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.