Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Walter W. Kroll Jr., filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Gol 5-1510, 5-1505) case represented by Kurland, Adam K, against Darlene Kroll Gallagher, Helen I. Kroll, represented by Bartley, Alana Renee, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Robert A Onofry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Gol 5-1510, 5-1505) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
|
PETITION
Date: July 29, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 29, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #2) Ex. Q Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022ANSWER
Date: October 14, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 28, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: October 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: September 28, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 23, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service |
||
December 09, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Reply Affirmation in further support of Respondents' Motion to Dismiss |
||
November 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Petition |
||
November 23, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exhibit B - 2019 Estate Planning Documents |
||
October 28, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 28, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
October 28, 2022 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
October 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) Ex. L - Correa Deed |
||
October 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Ex. 6 - December 5, 2018 Last Will and Testament of Helen Kroll |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.