Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Canaan Farms, Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Watkins, Liane Virginia, against Crawford, Town Of, represented by Browne, Erika C, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Robert A. Onofry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
|
PETITION
Date: July 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 24, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: September 02, 2022DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2022 | DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT | ||
September 02, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 02, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER For Settlement Purposes Only |
||
August 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
August 24, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 03, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 26, 2022 | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.