Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hedgerow Property Management, Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Barstow, Jean Royce, against Fowels, Kathleen, Trumble, Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with J. Michael Byrne presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Residential Limited (32) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time13 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Short Cause 251110-Court Trial: Short Cause; Hedgerow Property Management, Inc. vs. Trumble, J. ; Judge: J21216 Byrne J. Michael Judge: Byrne, J. Michael |
|
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default 226130-Judgment: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT: DEFAULT [226130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 229120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff REQUEST: DEFAULT [229120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jan 3 2007 Type: 244210 - Judgment: Clerk Default Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed 222120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUMMONS: FILED [222120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 212210-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff COMPLAINT [212210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.