Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Jason Fitzpatrick, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Foulke, Evan M, against Board Of Education Of Pine Bush Central School District, Crispell Middle School, Peter Johns, Pine Bush Central School District, Pine Bush High School, (total of 5) See All represented by Appelbaum, Michael Eric, Banks, Steven Leon, Darwin, David Lee, Intoccia, Gary J., Toner, Stephen Benedict, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Sandra B. Sciortino presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Orange. The plaintiff, Jason Fitzpatrick, is suing the Pine Bush Central School District, Board of Education of Pine Bush Central School District, Pine ...
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 19, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 20, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 11, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: June 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 26, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: March 13, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #10)
Date: April 19, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #7) Plaintiffs Bill of Particulars
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #12)
Date: April 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #12)
Date: April 19, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #12)
Date: April 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 19, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 19, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 17, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 26, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 17, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 21, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 25, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 21, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 21, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 18, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 10, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 10, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 23, 2024ORDER - AMENDED
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: October 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 25, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 20, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: February 23, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 20, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 19, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 19, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 19, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #7) District response to Notice to Admit
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 22, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #7) *Corrected*
Date: July 05, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 08, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 07, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #12)
Date: April 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #12)
Date: April 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #12)
Date: April 19, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #12)
Date: April 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #10)
Date: April 02, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: April 19, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #10)
Date: April 16, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #10)
Date: April 02, 2024ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #11)
Date: March 13, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #9)
Date: March 13, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 12, 2024SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: October 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 03, 2021SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 26, 2021SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 03, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #10)
Date: December 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #10)
Date: November 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 07, 2021STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2021ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 10, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 26, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 11, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 25, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: March 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 08, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 26, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 14, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 02, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: December 15, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 22, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #11)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2020MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 19, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 20, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #10) Johns' Employment File
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 18, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 18, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 18, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 14, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 11, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: April 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 11, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 23, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #12)
Date: April 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #12)
Date: April 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #10)
Date: October 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #10)
Date: December 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
April 23, 2024 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
April 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #10) Dr. Haas EBT transcript w-exhibits |
||
April 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #12) counsel emails re Haas EBT |
||
April 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #12) 12/6/23 letter to counsel |
||
April 19, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #12) | ||
April 19, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #12) Aaron Stark affidavit |
||
April 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #12) proposed second amended bill of particulars |
||
April 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #12) Dr. Haas EBT transcript w-exhibits |
||
April 19, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #12) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.