Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Ward Pavements, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zaita, Nicholas John, against Recon Construction Corp., Suresky At Hatfield Lane, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 29, 2024 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This legal complaint filed by Ward Pavements, Inc. in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Orange, involves a dispute with Recon Construction Corp. and Suresky at Hatfield Lane, LLC over unpaid costs totaling $307,853.02 for paving w...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: February 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: February 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: February 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: February 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: February 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: February 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: February 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 29, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 29, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K Filed Lien |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H 6.6.23 Email |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J September 13,2023 invoice |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D March Quote |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I August 16, 2023 Quote |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G 2022 Invoices |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C December 1, 2021 Price Increase |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F July 27, 2022 Quote |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E May 3,2022 Price increase |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A 8.2.21 Email |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.