Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Akarah, Amanie, Bussi, Nicholas C., Caster, Austin Robert, Hyman, Sarah Kristin, Joseph, Alan Lloyd, (total of 7) See All against John Doe, People Of The State Of New York, Vanessa Rolon-Rosario, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts Orange County Supreme Court with Nicholas N Derosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNicholas N Derosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions307 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseOrange County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time307 days |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: August 03, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 24, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 03, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: December 19, 2017EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 01, 2017ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: September 21, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 15, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT - ATTORNEY | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P Attorney Fee Affirmation |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - O Referee's Oath and Report of Amount Due |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - N Granted Order of Reference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.