Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Concetta Cirillo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bevacqua, Michael Francis, Kimple, Justin E., against Vincenzo Cirillo, represented by Burgoon, Kelly Anne, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Robert A Onofry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2023 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
January 26, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 26, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 25, 2023 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
January 25, 2023 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
January 25, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 25, 2023 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
January 24, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 19, 2023 | NOTICE OF HARD COPY EXHIBIT FILING - C | ||
January 19, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.