Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
City Of Newburgh, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Kaufman, Jeremy Brett, against In The Matter Of Foreclosure Of Tax Liens By Proceeding In Rem Pursuant To Article Eleven Of The Real Property Tax Law By The City Of Newburgh, As Against In Rem Parcel No. 296, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Catherine M Bartlett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine M Bartlett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
PETITION
Date: June 08, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 18, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: July 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 08, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: July 20, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 08, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 19, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 18, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
July 23, 2021 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
July 23, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 23, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 23, 2021 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
July 20, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | ||
June 08, 2021 | PETITION | ||
June 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Court Order (Decision on Motion) |
||
June 08, 2021 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.