Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Juan M. Castillo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mainetti, Alexander Eli, Mainetti, Michael, against Xiangyng He, represented by Kaplan, Bryan R, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with E Loren Williams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 23, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 23, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 23, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 31, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 26, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 26, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 23, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 31, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 10, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 29, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 02, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 19, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 15, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 23, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 24, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 29, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: September 29, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: September 29, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: October 18, 2022ANSWER
Date: June 23, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 23, 2021TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: September 29, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 19, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 10, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 24, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 22, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 09, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 10, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 09, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Settlement ltr to Court |
||
October 19, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 18, 2022 |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Adjournment Request - Matter Resolved |
||
September 29, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY NOI with Jury Demand and Certificate of Readiness |
||
September 29, 2022 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Pltf 3101(d) Dr. Hyman |
||
September 29, 2022 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Pltf 3101(d) Dr. Zheng |
||
August 02, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
July 26, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Post-Deposition Demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.