Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
April Shipman, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Owen, Patrick Saleem, against National Freight, Inc., Nfi Transportation, Raka Zerezghi, represented by Donnelly, Kevin Joseph, Levine, Mitchell B, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Craig S Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig S Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: July 22, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 14, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: June 14, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: June 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 16, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: June 16, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 19, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: August 11, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 11, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 17, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 01, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: July 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 19, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Reply Affirmation of Patrick S. Owen |
||
August 11, 2022 | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
August 11, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 11, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
July 22, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
July 19, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript |
||
July 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) Verified Bill of Particulars |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.