Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Velocity Capital Group Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Greenfield, Isaac Hirsch, Mendelberg, Gabriel, against Cabinets And More Llc, Clayton Ferreira Rodrigues, Zothex Flooring Inc, represented by Usher, Mikhail, in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Doyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 08, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 08, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: January 15, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 08, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: January 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 08, 2024RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #02)
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: January 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #02)
Date: January 03, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #02)
Date: January 03, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #01)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #01)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #01)
Date: April 28, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #01)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #01)
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #01)
Date: April 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: April 28, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 28, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 28, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: April 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY | ||
January 15, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 08, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
January 08, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 08, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #01) Zothex Summary Judgment case |
||
January 08, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 08, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #01) 4th Dept. Precedent |
||
January 05, 2024 | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
January 05, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 05, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.