Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Tessa Hill, in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 02, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2023DEFECT CHECKLIST
Date: April 06, 2022AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF NON EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 CREDIT AGREEMENT |
||
April 06, 2022 | DEFECT CHECKLIST | ||
March 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
March 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF NON EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS AFFIRMATION OF NON EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 15, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
March 15, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER | ||
March 15, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
March 15, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT |
||
March 15, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.