Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Originclear Inc, Progressive Water Treatment Inc, Tener R Eckelberry Jr, filed a(n) case represented by Benzenberg, Eric John, Passanante, Gustave Paul, against Ikahn Capital Llc, represented by Wells, Steven William, in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts with J. Scott Odorisi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJ. Scott Odorisi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
|
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 12, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 12, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 19, 2021STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: February 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 12, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 17, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 11, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021SUMMONS
Date: January 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 14, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: January 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 07, 2021ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 22, 2021ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 19, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 12, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 22, 2021STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 07, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 07, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 07, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 07, 2021ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Settlement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 07, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 12, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Affidavit of Confession |
||
April 07, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
April 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Summons & Complaint |
||
April 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Agreement |
||
April 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Email Service |
||
April 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Affirmation of Service |
||
April 07, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
April 07, 2021 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.