Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rochester Fairways Ii Owner Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Schroder, Michael T, against Victor Town Assessment Review, Victor Town Assessor, represented by Chalifoux, Sheila Mary, in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D. Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2020ANSWER
Date: September 03, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 11, 2019PETITION
Date: July 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #002)
Judge: Dennis, Hon. Brian D. |
|
August 26, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002)
Judge: Dennis, Hon. Brian D. |
|
July 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002)
Judge: Dennis, Hon. Brian D. |
|
June 02, 2020 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
June 02, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Attorney Affirmation of Sheila M. Chalifoux, Esq. |
||
June 02, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #002) Demand for Interrogatories; Decision |
||
June 02, 2020 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) To Compel Petitioner to Respond to Respondents' Demands for Interrogatories |
||
June 02, 2020 | Motion |
Compel (Motion #002) Decided: 08/27/2020Withdrawn Before Justice: Dennis, Hon. Brian D. Answer demanded: No Judge: Dennis, Hon. Brian D. |
|
September 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001)
Judge: Dennis, Hon. Brian D. |
|
September 03, 2019 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.