Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Assn, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Ella Todari, John Doe 1 Thru 12, in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D. Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions665 days |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time989 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #02)
Date: August 29, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 27, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 30, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 03, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: August 20, 2019EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 09, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #03)
Date: November 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #03)
Date: November 28, 2018ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: March 01, 2019ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE
Date: August 18, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: August 22, 2017JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #04)
Date: August 02, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #03)
Date: November 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #02)
Date: August 29, 2018RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 09, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: September 12, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #04)
Date: August 02, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #02)
Date: August 29, 2018ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: October 23, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 27, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2020 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
December 16, 2019 | REPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE | ||
December 13, 2019 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
November 07, 2019 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
October 10, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 10, 2019 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 12, 2019 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
September 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #004)
Judge: Dennis, Hon. Brian D. |
|
August 20, 2019 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
August 20, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.