Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Beneficial Homeowner Service Corp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Broyles, Mark K., Case, David P, against Jane Doe, Jennifer Brown, Jennifer Farmer, John Doe, Kenneth Brown, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts with Frederick G Reed presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 12, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions445 days |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time445 days |
RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 12, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 03, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 16, 2016EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2017MEMORANDUM
Date: October 31, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: July 31, 2017EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 19, 2017ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: February 09, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2017 | Memorandum of Sale and Terms of Sale | ||
October 31, 2017 | Affidavit of Publication Affidavit of Posting and Notice of Sale | ||
October 31, 2017 |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Report of Sale and Statement of Sale |
||
October 31, 2017 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
September 18, 2017 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 31, 2017 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
July 31, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided Reed (Court Activity) Judge: Reed, Hon. Frederick G. |
|
July 31, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Reed (Motion Part) Judge: Reed, Hon. Frederick G. |
|
July 26, 2017 |
OATH (Motion #001) REFEREE'S OATH AND REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE, AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE |
||
July 19, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #002) DOD/SCRA Search and Affirmation of Non-Military Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.