Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wesco Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Derrick, Richard Edward, against Dakota Medical Transportation, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 03, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: May 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 30, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 03, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment |
||
March 26, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Aff of Service- Additional Mailing |
||
December 30, 2020 | Affidavit of Service | ||
December 15, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.