Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jh Portfolio Debt Equities, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, against Roger Giuseppetti, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryConsumer Credit (Card) Transaction Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions78 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time101 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: April 10, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 06, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | EXECUTION | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | EXECUTION | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.