Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Larson, Nancy Jean, against Jessica H. Booker, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions101 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time101 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: April 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Mail Dated 05/08/2015 | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY Affirmation Dated 04/07/2015 |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Affirmation of Non Mil Status Dated 04/07/2015 | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Judgment Dated 04/07/2015 |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 15 02 11 AAOS |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 15 01 29 AOS |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS WITH NOTICE 14 12 22 SWN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.